01. Md. Helal Uddin - 20.02.2000-08.08.2001
0. Md Tawfiqul Alam - 08.08.2001-06.08.2003
03. Md. Abdul Kader - 09.06.2003 -10.11.2004
04.Mohammad Nabirul Islam (AR) -10.11.2004-30.11.2004
05. A, K, M Nuranabi Kabir - 30.11.2004-08.09.2005
06. Gulal Singh (AR) - 08.09.2005 - 25.09.2005
07. Ashrafuzzaman - 25.09.2005 - 21.11.07
08. Yasmin Begum (A.R) - 21.11.2007-0.01.2008
09. Mohammad Mafizur Rahman - 02.01.2008 - 02.06.2010
10. Md. Abdur Razzak (A.R) - 02.06.2010 .206.2010
11. AKM Azadur Rahman - 22.06.2010 -19.04.012
12. Md. Shah Momin (A.R) - 19.04.2012-24.05.2012
13. Nazmun Nahar - 24.05.2012-06.11.2012
14. Moktar Hossain - 06.11.2012 - 21.11.2013
15. Naznin Sultana (A.R) - 21.11.013 -25.11.013
16. Arun Kumar Mondal - 25.11.2013 - 28.09.2015
17. Md. Moinul Hasan (AR) - 28.09.2015 - 18.10.2015
18. Md. Hamayet Uddin - 18.10.2015 - 06.07.2017
19. Md. Moinul Hasan (AR) - 06.07.2017 -10.08.277
20. Nahida Akter-13.03.13 - 13.06.2019
21. Md. Masudul Alam (AR)- 16.06.2019 - 31.07.2019
22. Md. Usman Gani- 31.07.2019 -
Planning and Implementation: Cabinet Division, A2I, BCC, DoICT and BASIS